blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980652

EP0980652 - West [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wolf, Erich
Taminastrasse 14
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Hasler, Erich, et al
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner
Patentanwälte AG
Elestastrasse 8
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hasler, Erich, Dr., et al
c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner, Patentanwälte AG, Bahnhofstrasse 10
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
Application number, filing date99810690.030.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateCH1998000169217.08.1998         Original published format: CH 169298
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980652
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A41D13/00
[2000/08]
CPC:
A45F3/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Weste[2000/08]
English:West[2000/08]
French:Gilet[2000/08]
Examination procedure21.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
24.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR
18.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
08.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2002
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3732496  (H. G. MANTZ) [X] 1,5,9,11 * column 4, line 21 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]FR1565553  (REY ET CIE) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1333569  (REY ET CIE) [X] 1 * page 1, column 1, line L - column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2272041  (H.E. POCOCK) [X] 4,5,8 * page 1, column 2, line 23 - page 2, column 1, line 58; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US1905235  (C. L. MANDELERT) [X] 4,8 * page 1, line 65 - page 2, line 13; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US4106121  (G.W. BELSON) [X] 9-11 * column 3, paragraph 1 * * column 6, line 38 - line 41; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR1393397  (L'ESQUIMAU) [A] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2507441  (ANJUBAULT J.C.) [A] 7 * page 5, line 1 - line 26; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.