Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980947

EP0980947 - Rollable and stretchable tarpaulin device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kurt Steineberg GmbH
Bahnhofstrasse 2a
4900 Langenthal / CH
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Steineberg, Kurt
Bahnhofstrasse 2a
4900 Langentahl / CH
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Roshardt, Werner Alfred
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG
Eigerstrasse 2
Postfach
3000 Bern 14 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys.
Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach
3000 Bern 7 / CH
Application number, filing date99810744.518.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateEP1998081079418.08.1998         Original published format: EP 98810794
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980947
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E04H15/64, G09F15/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufwickelbare und spannbare Planenvorrichtung[2000/08]
English:Rollable and stretchable tarpaulin device[2000/08]
French:Dispositif de toile enroulable et tensionable[2000/08]
Examination procedure24.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/26]
18.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE2817210  (HILLEBRAND PETER, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,11,12 * page 7, line 7 - page 8, line 2 * * page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 2; figure - * [A] 3;
 [XA]EP0021834  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1,5-8,10 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 31 * * page 9, line 17 - page 11, line 12; figures 1-8 * [A] 2;
 [X]US4452230  (NELSON RICHARD C [CA]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 2; figures 3,4 *;
 [XA]DE2614960  (HOFFMANN HELMUT) [X] 1,3-5,7,11 * the whole document * [A] 8;
 [A]US3165110  (BROOKS THOMAS W) [A] 1,3,4,8,9,11 * column 1, line 7 - line 17 * * column 2, line 19 - line 35 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 40 - line 68; figures 1,8,9 *;
 [A]US4368586  (FORZELIAS TAGE N [SE]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 12; figure - *;
 [A]DE2844751  (WEMYSS GEORGE A) [A] 9,10 * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 25 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 21; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]EP0333907  (COLOR 2000 INC [US]) [A] 9 * column 3, line 26 - line 49 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 18; figures 1,2,7,10,11 *;
 [A]FR2349711  (FOURNIER ETS [FR]) [A] 10 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 23; figures 3,3A *