Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990421

EP0990421 - Hollow mill for tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer GmbH
Sulzer Allee 8
8404 Winterthur / CH
[2004/50]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Sulzer Orthopädie AG
Grabenstrasse 25
6340 Baar / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Zech, Manfred
Hinterwuhrstrasse 21
8450 Andelfingen / CH
02 / Favre, Alain
Frohbühlstrasse 2
8052 Zürich / CH
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2002/09]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/14]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date99810790.802.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateEP1998081097829.09.1998         Original published format: EP 98810978
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990421
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990421
Date:16.03.2005
Language:DE
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/16
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hohlfräser für Gewebe[2000/14]
English:Hollow mill for tissue[2000/14]
French:Fraise creuse pour tissus[2000/14]
Examination procedure08.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2005Fee for grant paid
12.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0611624  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,10 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 13 - line 40 * * figures 1,4,7 *;
 [X]JPS6090547  (TOURISHIYA KK, et al) [X] 1,2,8,10 * Titel *;; figure . *;
 [A]US5632747  (SCARBOROUGH NELSON [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 49 - line 51; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0824893  (ARTHREX INC [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * column 5, line 17 - line 20 *;
 [A]EP0574736  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 41; figure - *;
 [A]DE3408313  (HAGER & MEISINGER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * page 8, line 13 - line 36; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2040741  (JOWSEY A C) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 54 - line 61; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4538944  (HOUGEN EVERETT D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 39 * * column 2, line 48 - line 53 * * column 4, line 5 - line 12 *