Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083351

EP1083351 - Ball bearing and use of such a bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roulements Miniatures S.A.
Eckweg 8
2500 Biel / CH
[2001/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Laager, Alain
Malterres 6
2603 Péry / CH
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99810802.107.09.1999
[2001/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083351
Date:14.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/60, F16C25/06
[2001/11]
Designated contracting states[2001/49]
Former [2001/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kugellager und Verwendung desselben[2001/11]
English:Ball bearing and use of such a bearing[2001/11]
French:Roulement à billes et utilisation d'un tel roulement[2001/11]
Examination procedure15.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/29]
24.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.11.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.11.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.10.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4909640  (NAKANISHI TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column W *;
 [X]DE9400766U  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5458422  (ZERNICKEL ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,6 * column W *;
 [A]FR340215  (ERSTE AUTOMATISCHE GUSSSTAHLKU [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3989324  (TRAUT EARL W) [A] 1 * figure 15 *;
 [A]US5620263  (OHTSUKI HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]DE3108658  (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0505888  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8,9 * the whole document *
by applicantCH282265
 US5588754
 DE19634483