Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993093

EP0993093 - Method and control device for stabilising a power supply network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2002/15]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
ABB Industrie AG
Haselstrasse 16
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Asea Brown Boveri AG
Haselstrasse 16
5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Tambe, Shripad
Brisgistrasse 22
5403 Baden / CH
[2000/15]
Representative(s)ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Schweiz AG
Intellectual Property CH-IP
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]ABB Patent Attorneys
C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2000/27]ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Business Services Ltd. (SLE-I) Haselstrasse 16/699
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2000/15]Clerc, Natalia , et al
ABB Business Services Ltd, Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date99810848.422.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814585105.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19845851
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993093
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993093
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/18, H02M1/00
[2000/22]
Former International [2000/15]H02J3/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/06]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Regelungseinrichtung zur Stabilisierung eines Stromversorgungsnetzes[2000/15]
English:Method and control device for stabilising a power supply network[2000/15]
French:Méthode et dispositif de réglage pour la stabilisation d'un réseau d'alimentation de puissance[2000/15]
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/42]
08.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5155740  (AO NORIO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - line 61 * * column 6, line 2 - line 7 * * figure 3 *;
 [AD]US5463653  (DU PARC JACQUES [FR], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 64 - line 67 * * figure 8 *;
 [A]EP0707369  (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - line 50 * * column 2, line 57 - line 58 * * column 3, line 1 - line 5 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3733077  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - line 29 * * figures 1-4 *