Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995412

EP0995412 - Artificial joint cup [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]Method for loosening an insert from the shell of an artificial joint cup and artificial joint cup
[2003/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centerpulse Orthopedics Ltd.
Altgasse 44
6340 Baar / CH
[2003/44]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Sulzer Orthopädie AG
Grabenstrasse 25
6340 Baar / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Wymann, Burckhard
Ettenbühlstrasse 11
8353 Elgg / CH
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2002/09]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/17]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date99810861.724.09.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateEP1998081106523.10.1998         Original published format: EP 98811065
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995412
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995412
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46, A61F2/34
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Künstliche Gelenkpfanne[2003/31]
English:Artificial joint cup[2003/31]
French:Cupule articulaire artificielle[2003/31]
Former [2000/17]Verfahren zum Lösen eines Einsatzes von der Schale einer künstlichen Gelenkpfanne und künstliche Gelenkpfanne
Former [2000/17]Method for loosening an insert from the shell of an artificial joint cup and artificial joint cup
Former [2000/17]Méthode pour séparer un insert de la coquille d'une cupule articulaire artificielle et cupule articulaire artificielle
Examination procedure29.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
26.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2003Fee for grant paid
14.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
PT31.08.2004
LU24.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
LU24.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2006/13]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE29516473U  (KERAMED MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2398490  (CARBONE AG [DE]) [A] 5-7 * page 5, line 6 - line 16; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5641323  (CALDARISE SALVATORE [US]) [A] 6,7 * figures 1-4 *;
 [PA]WO9855051  (METAGEN LLC [US], et al) [PA] 5 * page 18, line 15 - page 20, line 14; figures 16,17 *;
 [A]WO9501139  (AO FORSCHUNGSINST [CH], et al);
 [A]DE19611250  (CERASIV GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0826347  (CERASIV GMBH [DE])