Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992320

EP0992320 - Tool for machining a hard material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Kristen, Ferdinand
Rosenweg 14
86916 Kaufering / DE
02 / Bongers-Ambrosius, Hans-Werner
Minorstr. 2
81477 München / DE
03 / Schittl, Josef
Alter Burgweg 495
6712 Thüringen / AT
04 / Reisinger, Erwin
Fasangasse 17
8055 Seiersberg / AT
 [2005/25]
Former [2000/15]01 / Kristen, Ferdinand
Rosenweg 14
86916 Kaufering / DE
02 / Bongers-Ambrosius, Hans-Werner
Minostr. 2
81447 München / DE
03 / Schittl, Josef
Alter Burgweg 495
6712 Thüringen / AT
04 / Reisinger, Erwin
Fasangasse 17
8055 Seiersberg / AT
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland , et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Wildi, Roland , et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date99810872.428.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateDE199814671209.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19846712
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992320
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992320
Date:09.04.2003
[2003/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992320
Date:16.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B23Q11/10, B23Q11/12, H02K5/20, H02K9/19, H02K11/04, B28D7/02
[2003/15]
Former International [2000/15]B23Q11/10, B23Q11/12, H02K5/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Bearbeitung eines harten Untergrundes[2000/15]
English:Tool for machining a hard material[2000/15]
French:Outil pour travailler des matériaux durs[2000/15]
Examination procedure09.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/50]
17.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2005Fee for grant paid
19.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.11.2005
FI16.11.2005
IE16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/17]FI16.11.2005
IE16.11.2005
IT16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/49]FI16.11.2005
IE16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
PT17.04.2006
Former [2006/40]FI16.11.2005
IE16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
Former [2006/38]FI16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
GR16.02.2006
Former [2006/35]FI16.11.2005
DK16.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI16.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[DY]DE4330520  (WURSTER WILHELM [DE]) [DY] 1-3 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 65 * * figure . *;
 [Y]DE19532976  (HUBER GERHARD DR ING [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 42 - line 46 * * column 4, line 13 - line 20 * * column 4, line 34 - line 35 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19626213  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 30 * * figure . *;
 [A]EP0480484  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 12 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9828833  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al) [A] 2,3 * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 20 * * page 9, line 21 - line 37 * * figure - *;
 [A]GB883684  (SIEMENS SCHUCKERT GREAT BRITIA, et al) [A] 4 * page 1, line 55 - line 65 * * page 2, line 110 - line 125 * * figure . *;
 [A]DE4411517  (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]) [A] 4 * column 1, line 10 - line 23 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 6 * * figure . *;
 [A]JPS60204241  ;
 [A]JPS60211198  ;
 [A]JPH08118198  ;
 [A]US2946244  (MAYNARD HARLAN JAMES [US]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 3 - line 10 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3136880  (AESCULAP WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 7,8 * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 110 * * page 14, line 16 - page 16, line L * * figures 1,5-8 *;
 [A]DE4123618  (FRANZ BUCAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 9,10 * column 1, line 32 - line 54 * * figure - *;
 [A]DE3545328  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 9,10 * column 1, line 38 - line 56 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 5 * * figure . *;
 [A]JPH06170835
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860227), vol. 010, no. 050, Database accession no. (E - 384), & JP60204241 A 19851015 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860315), vol. 010, no. 066, Database accession no. (M - 461), & JP60211198 A 19851023 (YASUKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08118198 A 19960514 (MAKINO MILLING MACH CO LTD) [A] 6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940920), vol. 018, no. 502, Database accession no. (M - 1676), & JP06170835 A 19940621 (SHIBUYA SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 9,10 * abstract *