Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995647

EP0995647 - Device for a vehicle safety belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rossé, René
32, route d'Alle
2900 Porrentruy / CH
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99810925.012.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateCH1998000211721.10.1998         Original published format: CH 211798
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995647
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995647
Date:11.02.2004
Language:FR
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/19
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für einen Fahrzeugsicherheitsgurt[2000/17]
English:Device for a vehicle safety belt[2000/17]
French:Dispositif pour ceinture de sécurité de véhicules[2000/17]
Examination procedure02.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
26.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2003Fee for grant paid
24.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.2002
31.10.200204   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2004
FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
IT11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
PT11.07.2004
LU12.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]CY11.02.2004
FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
LU12.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/12]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/03]FI11.02.2004
IE11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI11.02.2004
DK11.05.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI11.02.2004
GR11.05.2004
SE11.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI11.02.2004
SE11.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE9110642U  (SENNINGER , GÜNTHER) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 2, paragraph 4; figure 1; claims 1,8 * [A] 4;
 [A]GB2055945  (JOHNSON C B) [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2646640  (JOUVE JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2630065  (ORLUC JACQUES [FR]) [A] 4 * abstract *
by applicantDE3437424
 EP0427657