Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934740

EP0934740 - Mattress for massage beds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ermolao, Ottini
Via Gramsci 1
20030 Bovisio Masciago (Milano) / IT
[1999/32]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Tansini, Elio Fabrizio
Bugnion S.p.A.
Viale Lancetti 17
20158 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]Tansini, Elio Fabrizio
C/O Bugnion S.p.A. Viale lancetti 19
20158 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99830020.622.01.1999
[1999/32]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0024910.02.1998         Original published format: IT MI980249
[1999/32]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0934740
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0934740
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61H1/00, A47C19/00, A47C31/00, A61G7/057
[1999/32]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/44]
Former [1999/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Matratze für Massagebetten[1999/32]
English:Mattress for massage beds[1999/32]
French:Matelas pour lits masseurs[1999/32]
Examination procedure23.07.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/20]
13.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.10.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0374742  (BLASI ROSARIO DI) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-11 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,7;
 [Y]US5233712  (JURUS DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 49 - line 52; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0788786  (COSANI ADOLFO [ZA]) [Y] 7 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]DE2942287  (BIO ELECTRONIC [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,2 *
by applicantUS4469093