EP1024314 - Device for tensioning flexible elements wound onto pulleys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pellegrini Meccanica S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 8 37135 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Pellegrini Meccanica S.p.a. Viale delle Nazioni, 8 37135 Verona / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellegrini, Marco Terzo Vicolo Ungheria, 4 37031 Illasi (Verona) / IT | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion SpA Via G. Garibaldi 19 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via G. Garibaldi n. 19 37121 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830040.4 | 28.01.1999 | [2000/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024314 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024314 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/12, B23D55/10, B23D57/00, B24B21/20, B27B13/08, B62D55/30, B62M9/16, // B28B17/00, B61B12/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
F16H7/16 (EP);
B23D57/0069 (EP);
B24B21/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | RO | 19.02.1999 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spannen von um Rollen gewickelten flexiblelen Elementen | [2000/31] | English: | Device for tensioning flexible elements wound onto pulleys | [2000/31] | French: | Dispositif de serrage des éléments flexibles enroulés sur des poulies | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2003 | BE | 09.04.2003 | CH | 09.04.2003 | FI | 09.04.2003 | LI | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | DK | 09.07.2003 | GR | 09.07.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/23] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
FI | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 09.04.2003 | |
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR556595 (FROMHOLT ET CIE SOC) [A] 1,3* page 1, line 56 - line 62; figure 2 *; | [X]DE646799 (AEG) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE885475 (KIRSTEN PAUL DR-ING) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 35 - line 42; figure 1 * |