Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051943

EP1051943 - Handle for a cooking vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.02.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
La Termoplastic F.B.M. - S.r.l.
Via del Tornago, Z.I.
21010 Arsago Seprio (Varese) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
La Termoplastic F.B.M. S.R.L.
Via del Tornago, Z.I.
21010 Arsago Seprio (Varese) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Munari, Marco
Via della Travetta, 29
21010 Cardano al Campo / IT
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2000/46]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99830284.810.05.1999
[2000/46]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051943
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051943
Date:15.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47J45/06, A47J45/08
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   PT [2001/31]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesRO18.04.2001
SI18.04.2001
TitleGerman:Griff für ein Kochgerät[2000/46]
English:Handle for a cooking vessel[2000/46]
French:Poignée pour un récipient de cuisson[2000/46]
Examination procedure18.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
27.04.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
16.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.08.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE
26.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2002Fee for grant paid
29.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Viktor, Rainer
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 02  06.05.2003  11.05.2004  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
ALLUFLON S.P.A.
Pianacci
61040 MONDAVIO (PS) / IT
Opponent's representative
Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2005/26]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Viktor, Rainer
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
 02  06.05.2003  11.05.2004  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
ALLUFLON S.P.A.
Pianacci
61040 MONDAVIO (PS) / IT
Opponent's representative
Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
Former [2004/27]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
 02  06.05.2003  11.05.2004  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
ALLUFLON S.P.A.
Pianacci
61040 MONDAVIO (PS) / IT
Opponent's representative
Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
Former [2004/17]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
 02  06.05.2003  06.05.2003  INTERVENTION
ALLUFLON S.P.A.
Pianacci
61040 MONDAVIO (PS) / IT
Opponent's representative
Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
Former [2003/27]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
 02  06.05.2003   
ALLUFLON S.P.A.
Località Pianacci
61040 MONDAVIO (PS) / IT
Opponent's representative
Baldi, Claudio
Piazza Ghislieri, 3
60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT
Former [2002/34]
Opponent(s)01  29.06.2002  11.07.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Esmaltaciones San Ignacio, S.A.
44, Heraclio Fournier St
01006-Vitoria Spain / ES
Opponent's representative
Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
Principe de Vergara, 31
28001 Madrid / ES
04.03.2004No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
29.04.2004No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
14.05.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.07.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
11.10.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.10.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.09.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/12]
13.09.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition09.12.2005Appeal received No.  T1434/05
13.02.2006Statement of grounds filed
13.09.2007Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
14.11.2005Appeal received No.  T1434/05
13.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
24.09.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE15.05.2002
FI15.05.2002
DK15.08.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2003/48]BE15.05.2002
DK15.08.2002
Former [2003/46]DK15.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE19506419  (DINGERKUS GEB [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 40; figure - * [A] 7 [Y] 4;
 [YA]EP0808600  (BALLARINI PAOLO & FIGLI SPA [IT]) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 10; figure 2 * [A] 1;
 [X]EP0241410  (ZENKER GMBH & CO KG H [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 61; figure - *;
 [A]GB2030846  (HEALEY MOULDINGS LTD) [A] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 98 - page 2, line 100; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE19513245  (LEIFHEIT AG [DE])
by applicantEP0808600