Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053892

EP1053892 - Wheel with a brake for trolleys and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Derby Ruote S.r.L.
Via A. Volta, 15
20090 Assago (Milano) / IT
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Torti, Angelo
Via A. Volta, 15
20090 Assago (Milano) / IT
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Lecce, Giovanni
UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l.
Via Ariberto 24
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Lecce, Giovanni
UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. via G. Negri,10
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99830310.120.05.1999
[2000/47]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053892
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60B3/00, B60B33/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:Rad mit Bremse für Handwagen und dergleichen[2000/47]
English:Wheel with a brake for trolleys and the like[2000/47]
French:Roue avec frein pour chariots et similaires[2000/47]
Examination procedure23.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
29.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.08.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3917291  (SCHULTE KUGELFABRIK [DE]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 4 - column 8, line 16; figure - * [A] 6,12;
 [X]DE1605470  (SCHULTE & CO KUGELFAB) [X] 1 * page 8 - page 12; figure - *;
 [A]DE19524049  (TENTE ROLLEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 46 - line 60; figure - *;
 [A]DE19732920  (LUIGI PEREGO S R L [IT])