blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969158 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969158



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 92
27.06.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
17.09.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.09.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.09.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
06.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Description Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
06.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.03.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
01.03.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
15.01.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.11.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
31.07.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
27.07.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.03.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.03.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.03.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
24.06.1999 Description Search / examination 5
24.06.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.06.1999 Priority document Search / examination 17
24.06.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 12
07.06.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.06.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
07.06.1999 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 7