blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0969158
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0969158Global Dossier 18.04.2001A3
EP0969158 05.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
ITTO980581 02.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ITTO980581 03.01.2000A1
ITTO980581D 02.07.1998D0
Priority number Date
ITTO980581 02.07.1998