blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0969158

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
DE 
ES 
FR 
GB 
LI 
NL 
SE 
Examination procedure10.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:18.04.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:18.04.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.09.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010727
 
Event date:09.01.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE
 
Event date:09.01.2002 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 20010727
 
Event date:17.04.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020301
 
Event date:13.08.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20030128