Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969158

EP0969158 - Roof covering system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cullino, Marco
località Favorita,9
10040 Caselette (Torino) / IT
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Buzzi, Franco , et al
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Buzzi, Franco , et al
c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6
10133 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99830355.607.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0058102.07.1998         Original published format: IT TO980581
[2000/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969158
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969158
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04D1/18, E04D1/20, E04D1/06, E04D1/08
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [2002/02]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI27.07.2001
TitleGerman:Dacheindeckungssystem[2000/01]
English:Roof covering system[2000/01]
French:Système de recouvremont de toiture[2000/01]
Examination procedure27.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/38]
31.07.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
19.10.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.02.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT
01.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
06.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
10.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0823515  (RIGEL DI GIRARDI EGIDIO [IT]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 8, line 25 - line 32; figure - * [A] 5;
 [XA]FR1531036  (MARTINEZ) [X] 1-3,5 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 5; figures 1-5 * [A] 4,6-9;
 [XA]US5442888  (ILNYCKYJ PETER [CA]) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5-9;
 [A]CH254478  (U M A L SOCIETE ANONYME [BE]) [A] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2167192  (WEBER WILLIAM C) [A] 1,2,4,9 * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]US1539632  (BELDING GEORGE A) [A] 1,8 * figure - *