Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063864

EP1063864 - Bandwidth optimiser dynamically operating in connections relating to radiocommunications, particularly for DECT systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2007/49]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Rossi, Patrizia
Via Marco Valerio Corvo, 155
00176 Roma / IT
02 / D'Antonio, Luigi
Via Di Casal Monastero, 23
00131 Roma / IT
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Faggioni, Carlo Maria , et al
Fumero S.r.l.
Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Faggioni, Carlo Maria , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2004/39]Faggioni, Carlo Maria, Dr. Ing. , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2000/52]Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing. , et al
Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Franz-Josef-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99830393.723.06.1999
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1063864
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1063864
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/37]
Former [2000/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dynamisch arbeitender Bandbreitenoptimierer in Funkverbindungen, insbesondere für DECT-Systeme[2000/52]
English:Bandwidth optimiser dynamically operating in connections relating to radiocommunications, particularly for DECT systems[2000/52]
French:Optimiseur de bande passante fonctionnant dynamiquement dans des connexions concernant les radiocommunications, en particulier pour des systèmes DECT[2000/52]
Examination procedure22.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
28.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
11.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2007Fee for grant paid
08.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.12.2007
GB23.06.2008
IT30.06.2008
[2011/28]
Former [2009/30]NL05.12.2007
GB23.06.2008
Former [2008/25]NL05.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9803030  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0836291  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 15 *;
 [A]WO9731495  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 8 *;
 [A]  JIN-FU CHANG ET AL, "MULTICHANNEL ARQ PROTOCOLS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, New York, USA, (199304), vol. 41, no. 4, ISSN 0090-6778, page 592-598, XP000372700 [A] 1-5 * Section I *;; figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.223783