blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979702

EP0979702 - A portable boring-welding machine with simplified drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sir Meccanica S.r.l.
Viale Europa, 37
88100 Catanzaro / IT
[2004/19]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Sir Meccanica S.r.l.
Viale Europa, 37
88060 Germaneto di Catanzaro / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Siracusa, Rinaldo
Via Pascali, 7
88100 Catanzaro / IT
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Pederzini, Paolo
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Pederzini, Paolo
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date99830512.205.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateIT1998BO00094U12.08.1998         Original published format: IT BO980094 U
[2000/07]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979702
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979702
Date:26.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B23K7/10
[2000/07]
CPC:
B23K7/105 (EP,US); Y10T29/50 (EP,US); Y10T29/5107 (EP,US);
Y10T408/94 (EP,US); Y10T409/309352 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
Extension statesAL28.07.2000
LT28.07.2000
LV28.07.2000
RO28.07.2000
SI28.07.2000
TitleGerman:Tragbare Ausbohrschweissmaschine mit vereinfachtem Antrieb[2004/19]
English:A portable boring-welding machine with simplified drive[2000/07]
French:Appareil de soudage-perçage transportable avec entrainement simplifié[2000/07]
Former [2000/07]Tragbare Innenlochschweissmaschine mit vereinfachem Antrieb
Examination procedure28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2004Fee for grant paid
03.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.02.2005  03.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
ELSA S.R.L
SS 106 LOC. LA PETRIZIA
I-88050 ELLIA MARINA (CZ) / IT
 [2005/16]
04.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.07.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.04.2007Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.04.2007Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
CY26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
LU05.08.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
PT26.10.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
CY26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
LU05.08.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2006/13]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
NL26.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/46]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
IE05.08.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/18]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
DK26.08.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2005/14]AT26.05.2004
BE26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT26.05.2004
CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2005/06]CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
GR26.08.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2005/02]CH26.05.2004
FI26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
SE26.08.2004
Former [2004/51]CH26.05.2004
LI26.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]SU173111  ;
 [A]JPS58179564  ;
 [A]US2820420  (HAYES STANLEY W) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 10 - line 18 ** column 2, line 29 - line 65; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Derwent Publications Ltd., 881531/25-27, class 49h, (14/65), 12.2.64. & SU-A-173111 ( M.P. Baluev ) July 7, 1965., XP002122645 & SU173111 A 00000000 [A] 1,2,4,5
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840127), vol. 8, no. 20, Database accession no. (M - 271)<1457>, & JP58179564 A 19831020 (YOSHIKAWA KOGYO K.K.) [A] 1,3 * abstract *
ExaminationUS3955629
 US4550235
 US5090489
 EP0537124
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.