Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083036

EP1083036 - Electric injection assembly for injection presses for plastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEGRI BOSSI S.P.A.
Viale Europe 64
I-20093 Cologno Monzese / IT
[2001/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Meschia, Maurilio
Via Isonzo, 40
20040 Usmate (Milano) / IT
02 / Castelli, Romano
Via Lainate, 64
20017 Rho (Milano) / IT
 [2002/25]
Former [2001/11]01 / Meschia, Maurilio
Via Isonzo, 40
20040 Usmate (Milano) / IT
02 / Castelli Romano
Via Lainate, 64
20017 Rho (Milano) / IT
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli & C. S p A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99830556.907.09.1999
[2001/11]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1083036
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1083036
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/50
[2001/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/11]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Injektionsvorrichtung für Spritzgiesspressen für Kunststoffmaterialien[2001/11]
English:Electric injection assembly for injection presses for plastic materials[2001/11]
French:Dispositif d'injection electrique pour presses d'injection de matières plastiques[2001/11]
Examination procedure10.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
15.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2002Fee for grant paid
25.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.06.2002
BE19.06.2002
FI19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
LU07.09.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]AT19.06.2002
BE19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
LU07.09.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2004/10]AT19.06.2002
BE19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
CY30.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2004/05]AT19.06.2002
BE19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2003/48]AT19.06.2002
BE19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/46]AT19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
IE09.09.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/42]AT19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
IE09.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/21]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/20]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2003/16]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2003/10]AT19.06.2002
NL19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2003/09]NL19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2002/49]SE19.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5143736  (KUMAMURA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column A; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]GB831192  (ROLAND WUCHER) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 23; figure 1 *;
 [T]EP0549790  (VASILIEV GENNADY VLADIMIROVICH [SU], et al) [T] 1-5 * column A; figures 12,16 *;
 [T]US5634373  (CUFFE ALBERT A [CA], et al) [T] 1-5 * column A; figure 1 *