Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005055

EP1005055 - Illuminated pushbutton with colors and brightness electronically controlled [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G&A Engineering S.r.l.
Localita Miole snc
67063 Oricola (AQ) / IT
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Pontetti, Antonio
Loc. Colle Cerqueto snc
02020 Petrella Salto / IT
02 / Pontetti, Giorgia
Loc. Colle Cerqueto snc
02020 Petrella Salto / IT
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Sarpi, Maurizio
Studio Ferrario S.r.l.
Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Sarpi, Maurizio
Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
Former [2005/11]Sarpi, Maurizio
Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36
00187 Roma / IT
Former [2000/22]Perrotta, Luciana, Dr.
c/o D. Perrotta & C. S.a.s., Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 21
00186 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date99830712.816.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateIT1998RM0072727.11.1998         Original published format: IT RM980727
[2000/22]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005055
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005055
Date:07.11.2001
[2001/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01H13/02, H01H9/16
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Leuchttastschalter mit elektronisch geregelte Farben und Helligkeit[2000/22]
English:Illuminated pushbutton with colors and brightness electronically controlled[2000/22]
French:Bouton-poussoir illuminé avec couleurs et luminosité controlées électroniquement[2000/22]
Examination procedure21.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
18.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/25]
06.02.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0463285  (NIHON KAIHEIKI IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0329920  (TSCHUDIN & HEID AG [CH]) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 43 *;
 [Y]EP0548556  (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2707423  (TEAM [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0232137  (DOWTY ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [GB]) [Y] 1-3,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * column 4, line 14 - line 54 *;
 [Y]DE2913894  (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH) [Y] 1,7 * figure -; claims 1,3 *;
 [Y]DE9013448U  (SIEMENS) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *