Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976757

EP0976757 - A method of purifying vitamin B12 and/or derivatives thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirayama, Takayuki, c/o Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corp
Ctr. Research Lab., 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Noboru, Endo, c/o Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corp.
Ctr. Techn. Research Lab., 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Mizuta, Haruyoshi, c/o Nippon Mitsubishi Oil Corp.
Ctr. Techn. Research Lab., 8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Avellan-Hultman, Olle , et al
Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Avellan-Hultman, Olle , et al
Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB, inc. Avellán-Hultmann Patentbyra AB P.O.Box 10316
100 55 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99850103.509.06.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998016397611.06.1998         Original published format: JP 16397698
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976757
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976757
Date:08.08.2001
[2001/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976757
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07H23/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/18]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung von Vitamin B12 und/oder deren Derivate[2000/05]
English:A method of purifying vitamin B12 and/or derivatives thereof[2000/05]
French:Méthode de purification de la vitamine B12 et/ou de ses dérivés[2000/05]
Examination procedure14.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/13]
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2005Fee for grant paid
12.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB01.09.2005
DE03.01.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2006/35]DE03.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0109859  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB833067  (ROUSSEL UCLAF) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB718454  (PFIZER & CO C) [A] 1 * examples 1-6; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]GB816426  (ROUSSEL UCLAF) [A] 1 * examples 1-3; claim 2 *