EP1100215 - Method, apparatus and computer program for code allocation for variable data rates in a CDMA system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imbeni, Davide via Bacone, 35 41100 Modena / IT | 02 /
De Bernardi, Riccardo via del Portone, 4 40050 Monte San Pietro / IT | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Sandström, Staffan Sven, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Sandström, Staffan Sven, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 99850166.2 | 09.11.1999 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100215 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J11/00 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H04J13/0044 (EP,US);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Rechnerprogramm zur Kodezuweisung für variable Datenraten in einem CDMA-system | [2001/20] | English: | Method, apparatus and computer program for code allocation for variable data rates in a CDMA system | [2001/20] | French: | Procédé, dispositif et logiciel pour l'allocation de codes pour débit de données variable dans un système CDMA | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]WO9503652 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [DX] 1,4,5,7,15-17 * page 13, line 30 - page 17, line 37 * * claim 3 * [A] 6,8-14; | [XA]EP0814581 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1,4,15-17 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 53 * * figures 2,3 *[A] 2,3,5-14; | [XA]EP0878930 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,15-17 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 14 * * figure 6 * [A] 5-7,9-14 |