Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102157

EP1102157 - Method and arrangement for secure login in a telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2008
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Kriens, Peter
Finnasandsvägen 22
439 33 Onsala / SE
02 / Danne, Anders
Kastrupgatan 12
164 41 Kista / SE
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torhamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2007/42]Norin, Klas
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2001/21]Sandström, Staffan Sven , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date99850176.122.11.1999
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102157
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102157
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/15]
Former [2002/08](deleted) 
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode und Verfahren zum sicheren Anmelden in einem Telekommunikationssystem[2001/21]
English:Method and arrangement for secure login in a telecommunications system[2001/21]
French:Méthode et procédé pour un enregistrement protégé dans un système de télécommunications[2001/21]
Examination procedure28.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/15]
01.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2007Fee for grant paid
16.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.01.2002AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
22.01.2002SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.01.2002M01   Fee paid on   28.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.01.2008
BE09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
CY09.01.2008
DK09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
IT09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
SE09.04.2008
GR10.04.2008
ES20.04.2008
PT09.06.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/06]AT09.01.2008
BE09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
CY09.01.2008
DK09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
IT09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
SE09.04.2008
ES20.04.2008
PT09.06.2008
Former [2008/46]AT09.01.2008
BE09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
DK09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
SE09.04.2008
ES20.04.2008
PT09.06.2008
Former [2008/43]AT09.01.2008
BE09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
ES20.04.2008
PT09.06.2008
Former [2008/42]AT09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
ES20.04.2008
PT09.06.2008
Former [2008/39]AT09.01.2008
CH09.01.2008
FI09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
ES20.04.2008
Former [2008/35]CH09.01.2008
LI09.01.2008
NL09.01.2008
ES20.04.2008
Former [2008/27]NL09.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0003316  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1,10,11 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 19 * * page 14, line 5 - line 8 * * page 15, line 24 - page 16, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9944114  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 3-5,13-15 * page 8, line 6 - line 8 * * page 8, line 18 - line 27 * * page 21, line 18 - line 25 *;
 [A]WO9731306  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1,6,7,11,12,16 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 24 - line 35 *