Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010775

EP1010775 - Improved coating for cutting tool used for steel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seco Tools AB
737 82 Fagersta / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
SECO TOOLS AB
S-737 82 Fagersta / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Ruppi, Sakari
Smällbovägen 6A
737 82 Fagersta / SE
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel , et al
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Taquist, Lennart , et al
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date99850195.108.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateUS1998020768709.12.1998         Original published format: US 207687
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010775
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010775
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C23C30/00, C23C16/36, C23C16/40, C23C16/30
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/10]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Beschichtung von Schneidwerkzeug für Stahl[2000/25]
English:Improved coating for cutting tool used for steel[2000/25]
French:Revêtement amélioré pour un outil de coupe utilisé pour l'acier[2000/25]
Examination procedure12.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
22.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK
03.04.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
20.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2004Fee for grant paid
02.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0600115  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,5-9,17 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 6 * * page 5, line 4 - line 31 * * examples 3,5,10,11; claims 1,3-6; table - * [A] 3,10-12,16;
 [YA]EP0685572  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,5-9,17 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 6 * * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 29 * * claims 1,3-7; table - * [A] 2-4,10-12,16;
 [A]US5786069  (LJUNGBERG BJORN [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *