Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022327

EP1022327 - Process of treating fabrics with a laundry additive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Del Duca, Valerio (NMN)
Corso S. Agata 61/N
80064 Massalubrense (Napoli) / IT
02 / Esposito, Andrea (NMN)
V. Cardinal Caprara 34
00167 Rome / IT
03 / Leone, Milena (NMN)
Via Confalonieri 21
21013 Gallarate (VA) / IT
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Intellectual Property Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2004/05]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2000/30]Gault, Nathalie , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date99870010.822.01.1999
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022327
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022327
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/39, C11D3/20, C11D3/36
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/14]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Behandlung von Textilien mit einem Wäschezusatzmittel[2000/30]
English:Process of treating fabrics with a laundry additive[2000/30]
French:Procédé pour le traitement de textiles en utilisant un additif pour la lessive[2000/30]
Examination procedure20.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2006Fee for grant paid
24.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Request for further processing for:21.01.2004Request for further processing filed
21.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
CH05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
LI05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT05.04.2006
BE05.04.2006
CH05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
LI05.04.2006
NL05.04.2006
DK05.07.2006
SE05.07.2006
PT05.09.2006
Former [2007/03]AT05.04.2006
CH05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
LI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2007/02]AT05.04.2006
FI05.04.2006
SE05.07.2006
Former [2006/49]SE05.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0844302  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-3,6-17 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0845526  (EKA CHEMICALS AB [SE]) [A] 1-4,6-12,14-17 * column 5, line 20 - line 26; example 1; claims 1,8 *;
 [A]US3965024  (SCHMADEL EDMUND, et al) [A] 1-6,8-13,15,17 * column 10, line 3 - line 22; example 6; claims 1,8,11 *;
 [A]US5066749  (LEIGHTON JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,10-17 * abstract * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 36; table III *