blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0971027 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP98870226 EP98870227 EP99870025 EP99870026 EP99870029 EP99932387 EP99932388 EP99932389 EP99932390 EP99933892



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0002987Global Dossier 23.08.2001A3
WO0002987 20.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0002986Global Dossier 02.08.2001A3
WO0002986 20.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0002982Global Dossier 14.06.2001A3
WO0002982 20.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012065114Global Dossier 15.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113099764 03.05.2011
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US60373009 22.10.2009
US91128304 04.08.2004
US72039500 20.12.2000
US201113302492 22.11.2011
US96731810 14.12.2010
US35758709 22.01.2009
US78573610 24.05.2010
US16564405 24.06.2005
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011207643Global Dossier 25.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
US201113099764 03.05.2011
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US60373009 22.10.2009
US91128304 04.08.2004
US72039500 20.12.2000
US96731810 14.12.2010
US35758709 22.01.2009
US78573610 24.05.2010
US16564405 24.06.2005
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011082064Global Dossier 07.04.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US60373009 22.10.2009
US91128304 04.08.2004
US72039500 20.12.2000
US96731810 14.12.2010
US35758709 22.01.2009
US78573610 24.05.2010
US16564405 24.06.2005
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2010234258Global Dossier 16.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US60373009 22.10.2009
US91128304 04.08.2004
US72039500 20.12.2000
US35758709 22.01.2009
US78573610 24.05.2010
US16564405 24.06.2005
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2010041573Global Dossier 18.02.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US60373009 22.10.2009
US91128304 04.08.2004
US72039500 20.12.2000
US35758709 22.01.2009
US16564405 24.06.2005
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2009131294Global Dossier 21.05.2009A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US35758709 22.01.2009
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008227676Global Dossier 18.09.2008A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US15410908 20.05.2008
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007232507Global Dossier 04.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US80573807 24.05.2007
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
US91128304 04.08.2004
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007099818Global Dossier 03.05.2007A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US63605206 08.12.2006
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
US91128304 04.08.2004
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2006172903Global Dossier 03.08.2006A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US39571606 31.03.2006
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
US91128304 04.08.2004
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005239667Global Dossier 27.10.2005A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US16564405 24.06.2005
US91128304 04.08.2004
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005043208Global Dossier 24.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US91128304 04.08.2004
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005043205Global Dossier 24.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
US91111504 04.08.2004
US72034601 28.02.2001
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US71478403 17.11.2003
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005009727Global Dossier 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US91113804 04.08.2004
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US33852103 08.01.2003
US71479303 17.11.2003
US9915666 12.07.1999
US72039401 06.04.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004147426Global Dossier 29.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US72034601 28.02.2001
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US71478403 17.11.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004116320Global Dossier 17.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US33852103 08.01.2003
US71479303 17.11.2003
US72039401 06.04.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003211963Global Dossier 13.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US33852103 08.01.2003
US9915666 12.07.1999
US72039401 06.04.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7012047Global Dossier 14.03.2006B2
US2004106528 03.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US31024702 05.12.2002
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US72040400 20.12.2000
US71629703 18.11.2003
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6790815Global Dossier 14.09.2004B1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
US40386703 31.03.2003
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2003521445Global Dossier 15.07.2003A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002524573Global Dossier 06.08.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5289651BGlobal Dossier 11.09.2013B2
JP2003521554 15.07.2003A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4493849BGlobal Dossier 30.06.2010B2
JP2002520495 09.07.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4201984BGlobal Dossier 24.12.2008B2
JP2003521555 15.07.2003A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1144579Global Dossier 19.01.2005B1
EP1144579 17.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99932390 12.07.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1144578Global Dossier 12.01.2005B1
EP1144578 17.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP99932389 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1144566Global Dossier 19.05.2010B2
EP1144566 04.10.2006B1
EP1144566 17.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP99932387 12.07.1999
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1123376Global Dossier 17.10.2012B2
EP1123376 13.09.2006B1
EP1123376 16.08.2001A2
Priority number Date
EP99932388 12.07.1999
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1095128Global Dossier 09.03.2011B2
EP1095128 20.04.2005B1
EP1095128 02.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
EP99933892 12.07.1999
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0971026Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0971021Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0971027Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR019367 13.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT286962T 15.01.2005T
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT287439T 15.02.2005T
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT293676T 15.05.2005T
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT339494T 15.10.2006T
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU755629B 19.12.2002B2
AU4870199 01.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4870299 01.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4870399 01.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4870499 01.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4984699 01.02.2000A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9911976 11.08.2009B1
BR9911976 27.03.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9911987 27.03.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9912023 18.11.2008B1
BR9912023 03.04.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9912029 13.01.2009B1
BR9912029 03.04.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9912033 22.05.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2332958 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2335576 10.04.2007C
CA2335576 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2336658 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2336666 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2337040 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1167780C 22.09.2004C
CN1334858 06.02.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100384974C 30.04.2008C
CN1309690 22.08.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1321187 07.11.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1337995 27.02.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100415861C 03.09.2008C
CN1789399 21.06.2006A
Priority number Date
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ200158 17.04.2002A3
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ200159 17.04.2002A3
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69923227T 05.01.2006T2
DE69923227D 17.02.2005D1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69923351T 05.01.2006T2
DE69923351D 24.02.2005D1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69924847T 29.12.2011T3
DE69924847T 27.04.2006T2
DE69924847D 25.05.2005D1
Priority number Date
EP99933892 12.07.1999
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69933230T 07.02.2013T3
DE69933230T 30.08.2007T2
DE69933230D 26.10.2006D1
Priority number Date
EP99932388 12.07.1999
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
US9915678 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69933474T 19.05.2011T3
DE69933474T 06.06.2007T2
DE69933474D 16.11.2006D1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EG22149 30.09.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2237123T 16.07.2005T3
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2237124T 16.07.2005T3
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2273504T 01.05.2007T3
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0104131 28.05.2003A3
HU0104131 28.03.2002A2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0104340 28.12.2002A3
HU0104340 29.04.2002A2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US9915666 12.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0200238 28.01.2004A3
HU0200238 29.07.2002A2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ID27384 05.04.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ID28314 10.05.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA24922 01.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR200100002T 23.09.2002T2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
EP99870025 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR200100003T 21.06.2001T2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6413920 02.07.2002B1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915665 12.07.1999
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6451751 17.09.2002B1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US9915679 12.07.1999
EP98870155 28.10.1998
US72040100 20.12.2000
EP99870025 11.02.1999
EP99870026 11.02.1999
EP99870029 15.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6511948 28.01.2003B1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US9915680 12.07.1999
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US72040400 20.12.2000
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6566312 20.05.2003B2
US2003064899 03.04.2003A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US15779002 29.05.2002
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US72039500 20.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6699823 02.03.2004B2
US2003153474 14.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
US31024702 05.12.2002
EP98870156 10.07.1998
US72040400 20.12.2000
EP99870026 11.02.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0002991Global Dossier 20.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0002981Global Dossier 16.08.2001A3
WO0002981 20.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0971025Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0971024Global Dossier 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT341608T 15.10.2006T
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1250694C 12.04.2006C
CN1335883 13.02.2002A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ200160 17.04.2002A3
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ200188 17.04.2002A3
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2242404T 14.07.2011T5
ES2242404T 01.11.2005T3
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2274628T 18.10.2010T5
ES2274628T 16.05.2007T3
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID28753 28.06.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID29040 26.07.2001A
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA24921 01.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA24993 01.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR200100004T 21.05.2001T2
Priority number Date
EP98870227 28.10.1998
EP98870156 10.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR200100005T 21.06.2001T2
Priority number Date
EP98870226 28.10.1998
EP98870155 28.10.1998