EP0971027 - Amine reaction compounds comprising one or more active ingredient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bettiol, Jean-Luc Philippe 93 Avenue Slegers 1200 Brussels / BE | 02 /
Denutte, Hugo Molenstraat 12 9308 Hofstade / BE | 03 /
Perneel, Peter Marie Kamiel Nieuwe Gentweg 11 8000 Brugge / BE | 04 /
Smets, Johan Bollenberg 79 3210 Lubbeek / BE | 05 /
Busch, Alfred Handelsstraat 210 1840 Londerzeel / BE | 06 /
Laudamiel, Christophe 20 A Rue de la Violette 1000 Brussels / BE | 07 /
Sanchez-Pena, Maria Montserrat 97 Rue Royale, Ap. 81 1000 Brussels / BE | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2000/02] | Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle, et al BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 99870026.4 | 11.02.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | EP19980870156 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: EP 98870156 | EP19980870227 | 28.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98870227 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971027 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/50, C11D3/00, C08F8/28, C07D295/13, C07C251/14 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C11D17/06 (EP);
C11D3/001 (KR);
C08L101/025 (KR);
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D3/2072 (EP);
C11D3/2093 (EP);
C11D3/22 (EP);
C11D3/37 (EP);
C11D3/3719 (KR);
C11D3/3723 (EP);
C11D3/50 (EP);
C11D3/507 (EP);
C11D2111/12 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aminierungsprodukte enthaltende ein oder mehrere Wirkstoffe | [2000/02] | English: | Amine reaction compounds comprising one or more active ingredient | [2000/02] | French: | Produits de réaction d'aminé comprenant un ou plusieurs ingrédients actifs | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0011499 (UNILEVER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-5,7,11,13-20 * LF 165 *;; example -; claims 1-7,10,19,20,23 *; | [X]WO9319787 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1-6; claim 1; table 5 *; | [X]US5270379 (MCANDREW THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10 * examples 3,4,7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0831143 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-18* synthesis example V to IX *;; example 1; claims 1-13,15 *; | [A]EP0841391 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-18 * perfume material 1-4 described on pages 31 and 32*;; example -; claims 1-16 *; | [X] - KAMOGAWA H ET AL, "Chemical release control- Schiff bases of perfume aldehydes and aminostyrenes", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: POLYMER CHEMISTRY EDITION, (1982), vol. 20, pages 3121 - 3129, XP002084908 [X] 1,4,5,16 * page 3121, paragraph 1 - page 3122, paragraph 1; tables II,III * * page 3128, paragraph 3 * * page 3128, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pol.1982.170201108 | [X] - VIGUERA A -R ET AL, "A WATER-SOLUBLE POLYLYSINE-RETINALDEHYDE SCHIFF BASE. STABILITY IN AQUEOUS AND NONAQUEOUS ENVIRONMENTS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19900215), vol. 265, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2527 - 2532, XP002057413 [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraph 4 * |