Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035199

EP1035199 - Perfumed detergent tablet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/09]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arnau, José, (NMN)
2 rue Jean-Philippe Rameau
78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR
02 / Cunningham, Philip Andrew
2 Park Drive, Forrest Hall
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9JN / GB
03 / Green, Michael, (NMN)
69 Oulton Close, Meadow Rise Kenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE5 4SX / GB
04 / McRitchie, Allan Campbell
35 Monkseaton Drive, Whitley Bay
Tyne & Wear, NE26 1SY / GB
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2000/37]Gault, Nathalie , et al
BVBA Procter & Gamble Europe Sprl Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date99870082.730.04.1999
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateEP1999087004312.03.1999         Original published format: EP 99870043
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035199
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035199
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035199
Date:27.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D3/50, C11D3/12, C11D3/36, C11D3/20
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/42]
Former [2001/36](deleted) 
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Parfümierte Waschmitteltablette[2000/37]
English:Perfumed detergent tablet[2000/37]
French:Comprimé détergent parfumé[2000/37]
Examination procedure23.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
04.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2008Fee for grant paid
14.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.07.2001AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
27.07.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.07.2001M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
CH30.04.2008
IE30.04.2008
LI30.04.2008
LU30.04.2008
SE27.05.2008
GR28.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/28]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
CH30.04.2008
IE30.04.2008
LI30.04.2008
LU30.04.2008
SE27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/30]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
CH30.04.2008
IE30.04.2008
LI30.04.2008
SE27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/12]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
CH30.04.2008
LI30.04.2008
SE27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/46]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
DK27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
SE27.05.2008
Former [2008/43]AT27.02.2008
BE27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
Former [2008/39]AT27.02.2008
FI27.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[ED]EP1026229  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [ED] 1-16 * example 1 * * claim - * * page 11, line 31 - line 32 * * page 14, line 14 - line 16 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 26 *;
 [ED]EP1026228  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [ED] 1-16 * example 1; claim - *;
 [ED]EP1026227  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [ED] 1-16 * example 1; claim - *;
 [DX]EP0846754  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-11,15,16 * example 1; claim - * * page 4, line 3 - line 11 *;
 [DX]EP0846755  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-11,15,16 * example 1; claim - * * page 4, line 19 - line 27 *;
 [DX]EP0846756  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-11,15,16 * example 1; claim - *;
 [E]WO9927069  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [E] 1-11,14 * claims 1-8 * * page 64 - page 65 * * page 75 *;
 [E]WO9931215  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [E] 1,5,14 * page 50 - page 53 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO9906521  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,14 * example 1; claim 1 * * page 57, line 28 - line 29 * * page 55, line 9 - line 16 * * page 53, line 14 - line 26 *;
 [X]WO9520030  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * examples 1,4 * * claims 1-13,27-34 *;
 [A]WO9705226  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * claims 1-3 *;
 [E]WO9940171  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [E] 1 * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 25 * * page 24, line 5 - page 25, line 3 * * claims 1-8 *