Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972464

EP0972464 - Method for manufacturing brushes and brush manufacturing machine applying this method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2009Correction of patent specificationpublished on 25.03.2009  [2009/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FIRMA G.B. BOUCHERIE, naamloze vennootschap
Stuivenbergstraat 106
8870 Izegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
FIRMA G.B. BOUCHERIE, naamloze vennootschap
Stuivenbergstraat 106
8870 Izegem / BE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Firma G.B. BOUCHERIE, naamloze vennootschap
Stuivenbergstraat 106
8870 Izegem / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Boucherie, Bart Gerard
Ambachtenstraat 84
8870 Izegem / BE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Donné, Eddy
M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Anvers / BE
Application number, filing date99870154.413.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateBE1998000053714.07.1998         Original published format: BE 9800537
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972464
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972464
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0972464
Date:25.03.2009
[2009/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A46D3/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von Bürsten sowie Bürstenherstellungsmaschine zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens[2000/03]
English:Method for manufacturing brushes and brush manufacturing machine applying this method[2000/03]
French:Procédé de fabrication de brosses et machine de fabrication de brosses pour l'application de ce procédé[2000/03]
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
22.02.2002Observations by third parties
01.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2003Fee for grant paid
06.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL03.03.2004
[2005/05]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0346646  (SCHLERF CORONET WERKE [DE]) [A] 1,16 * column 10, line 41 - column 13, line 44; figure - *;
 [A]EP0567672  (BOUCHERIE NV G B [BE]) [A] 1,16 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 4; figure - *
otherEP0405204