Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099894

EP1099894 - Flexible hose [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Revocation of patentpublished on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plastiflex Belgium
Beverlosesteenweg 99
3583 Paal-Beringen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
PLASTIFLEX BELGIUM
Beverlosesteenweg 99
3583 Paal-Beringen / BE
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
PLASTIFLEX EUROPE N.V.
Beverlosesteenweg 99
3583 Paal-Beringen / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Diels, Domin
Rooien 7
2275 Gierle / BE
02 / Dillen, Eric
Schransstraat 32
2270 Herenthout / BE
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Luys, Marie-José A.H. , et al
Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Livornostraat 7
1060 Brussel / BE
Application number, filing date99870235.110.11.1999
[2001/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099894
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099894
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16L11/118, A47L9/24
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Flexibler Schlauch[2001/20]
English:Flexible hose[2001/20]
French:Tuyau flexible[2001/20]
Examination procedure16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
28.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.05.2004   
Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG
Hellinger Str. 1
97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschke, Markus Artur Heinz
Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/29]
Opponent(s)01  18.05.2004   
Fränkische Rohrwerke Gebr. Kirchner Gmbh & Co. KG
Hellinger Str. 1
97486 Königsberg/Bayern / DE
Opponent's representative
Muschke, Markus, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe, Dr.Dr. Sandmair, Dr. Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
24.06.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.04.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.04.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
CY10.11.2003
IE10.11.2003
LU10.11.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
[2005/03]
Former [2005/02]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
CY10.11.2003
LU10.11.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/39]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
CY10.11.2003
LU10.11.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/36]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
CY10.11.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/29]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
Former [2004/22]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
Former [2004/14]AT20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
Former [2004/12]FI20.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE9210126U  (CHR. BERGHÖFER) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4194081  (COOPER JERRY W [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 47 - line 68 * * column 6, line 1 - line 12 *;
 [A]GB2322180  (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE29601293U  (TRUPLAST KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2,4 *