Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035411

EP1035411 - Electrochemical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
AVL Medical Instruments AG
Stettemerstrasse 28
8207 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Steiner, Gregor, Dipl.-Chem.
Rudolfstrasse 21
8010 Graz / AT
02 / Schaffar, Bernhard, Dr.
Nepomukgasse 27
8045 Graz / AT
03 / Schinnerl, Marie-Luise
Schönegg 1
8102 Semriach / AT
04 / Ritter, Christoph, Dr.
Mexikoweg 12
8045 Graz / AT
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Babeluk, Michael
Patentanwalt
Florianigasse 26/3
1080 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Mag.
Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17
1150 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99890077.305.03.1999
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035411
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035411
Date:12.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/333
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrochemischer Sensor[2000/37]
English:Electrochemical sensor[2000/37]
French:Capteur électrochimique[2000/37]
Examination procedure16.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
12.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2005Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.03.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2007Fee for grant paid
20.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination02.05.2005Appeal received No.  T0885/05
04.07.2005Statement of grounds filed
27.03.2007Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
27.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)13.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2289541  (SIEMENS PLESSEY CONTROLS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,11 * page 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]JPH01112148  ;
 [X]US4613422  (LAUKS IMANTS R [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 25 - line 30 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 54; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4739380  (LAUKS IMANTS R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 28 - line 40; figure 1A *;
 [X]EP0190005  (INTEGRATED IONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 7, line 17 - line 20 * * page 9, line 4 - line 23; figure 5 * * page 11, line 6 - line 9; figure 4 *;
 [X]US5507936  (HATSCHEK RUDOLF A [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 7, line 63 - column 9, line 46; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5352352  (TSUKADA KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 6, line 1 - line 33; figure 4 *;
 [DX]DE19506863  (KURT SCHWABE INST FUER MES UND [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,7,8 * column 3, line 27 - line 54; figures 4-6 *;
 [X]EP0651248  (SIEMENS PLESSEY CONTROLS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,11 * column 3, line 37 - line 56; figures 4A,4B *;
 [A]DE3840962  (HELLIGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 60 *;
 [DA]EP0603154  (AVL MEDICAL INSTR AG [CH]) [DA] 1,11 * page 1, line 41 - line 41 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890807), vol. 013, no. 351, Database accession no. (P - 912), & JP01112148 A 19890428 (TERUMO CORP) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-169993 [25] [ ] * abstract *
 [X]  - VAN DER SPIEGEL J ET AL, "The extended gate chemically sensitive field effect transistor as multi-species microprobe", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, OCT. 1983, SWITZERLAND, vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0250-6874, pages 291 - 298, XP002111737 [X] 1-4 * page 294, paragraph L - page 296, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0250-6874(83)85035-5
 [A]  - W.GÖPEL ET AL. (EDTS.), Sensors - A Comprehensive Survey, Volume 2, Chemical and Biochemical Sensors, Part I, NEW YORK, VCH PUBLISHERS INC., (1991), XP002111738 [A] 1,9 * p.239-339, Friedrich Oehme: "Liquid Electrolyte Sensors: Potentiometry, Amperometry, and Conductometry"; page 244, line 11 - page 245, line 7 * * page 266, line 21 - page 267, line 17 * * page 283; figures 7-35 *