Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0942513

EP0942513 - Electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATB Austria Antriebstechnik Aktiengesellschaft
G.-Bauknecht-Strasse 1
8724 Spielberg (Steiermark) / AT
[1999/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Sand, Hansjörg
Pausendorferstrasse 7
8724 Spielberg/zeltweg / AT
[1999/37]
Representative(s)Hehenberger, Reinhard , et al
BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/37]Hehenberger, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8
1070 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99890082.310.03.1999
[1999/37]
Priority number, dateAT1998000042210.03.1998         Original published format: AT 42298
[1999/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0942513
Date:15.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0942513
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/102, H02K7/20, H02K9/14, H02K11/00
[1999/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/44]
Former [2001/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  LI 
Former [1999/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektromotor[1999/37]
English:Electric motor[1999/37]
French:Moteur électrique[1999/37]
Examination procedure31.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
08.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
05.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.11.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE1613149  (HIMMELWERK AG) [X] 1-8 * page 3, lines 9-19 * * page 3, lines 9-19 * [Y] 1-8;
 [YX]GB1040864  (WARNER ELECTRIC BRAKE & CLUTCH) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, lines 34-95 * * page 3, lines 107-122 * [X] 6,7;
 [A]FR2416386  (LEROY SOMER MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 4,5 * page 4, line 23 - page 9, line 32 *;
 [A]DE4225158  (LACHENMAIER SEPP [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6130932
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860627), vol. 010, no. 184, Database accession no. (E - 415), [A] 1-8 * the whole document *