Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044873

EP1044873 - Underwater hull of a ship [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alsphere Engineering Schiffbau und Architektur GmbH
Sonnenfelsgasse 3/6
1010 Wien / AT
[2003/36]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
Eder, Theodor Dipl.-Ing.
Herzogbergstrasse 149
AT-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Eder, Theodor Dipl.-Ing.
Herzogbergstrasse 149
2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT
 [2003/36]
Former [2000/42]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Casati, Wilhelm , et al
Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8
1061 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Casati, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Itze, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Amerlingstrasse 8
1061 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99890126.814.04.1999
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044873
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044873
Date:30.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B63B1/40, B63B1/18, // B63B1/04, B63B1/38
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesBE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/27]
Former [2000/42]BE,  CH,  CY,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI18.04.2001
TitleGerman:Unterwasserkörper eines Schiffes[2000/42]
English:Underwater hull of a ship[2000/42]
French:Oeuvres vives d'une coque de bateau[2000/42]
Examination procedure18.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
17.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2004Fee for grant paid
29.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
PT30.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/06]GR30.09.2004
SE30.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE30.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[E]DE19847861  (EDER THEODOR [AT]) [E] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9509102  (HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN BV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 27 *;
 [A]JPH09193884  ;
 [A]US4870919  (ALLISON BILL W [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 55 - line 68 * * column 3, line 28 - line 52 *;
 [A]FR2502104  (DELCOURT DIDIER [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5211126  (JOHNSON ROBERT K [US]);
 [A]DE2812616  (KANEI YUTAKA);
 [A]US5402743  (HOLDERMAN JIM D [US])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 097, no. 011, [A] 1,2 * abstract *
by applicantUS3698342