EP0971072 - Method for making asphalt coverings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÖSTERREICHISCHE VIALIT GESELLSCHAFT mbH Josef Reiter Str. 78 5280 Braunau/Inn / AT | [2003/18] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states ÖSTERREICHISCHE VIALIT GESELLSCHAFT mbH Josef Reiter Str. 78 5280 Branau/Inn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleier, Johann, Dipl. Ing. Dr. Mamling 1A 4962 Mining / AT | 02 /
Bruckbauer, Alexander Hans-Steiningergasse 20 5280 Braunau/Inn / AT | 03 /
Schinkinger, Thomas, Dipl. Ing. Am Stadlfeld 12 4040 Linz / AT | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Grabherr, Claudia Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Grabherr, Claudia, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei Dipl.-Ing. Rolf Puchberger Dipl.-Ing. Peter Puchberger Dipl.-Ing. Claudia Grabherr-Puchberger Singerstrasse 13, Postfach 55 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 99890230.8 | 07.07.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | AT19980001198 | 10.07.1998 Original published format: AT 119898 | [2000/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971072 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971072 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/18, E01C19/48, E01C19/17 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
E01C19/48 (EP);
E01C19/17 (EP);
E01C7/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Asphaltbelages | [2000/02] | English: | Method for making asphalt coverings | [2000/02] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de revêtements d'asphalte | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 15.01.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2003 | LU | 07.07.2003 | MC | 31.07.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | CY | 07.07.2003 | |
LU | 07.07.2003 | ||
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | CY | 07.07.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | PT | 04.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8103039 (SKANSKA CEMENTGJUTERIET AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,14 * page 3, line 5 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0442593 (SCANROAD INC [US]) [A] 7* column 11, line 35 - line 52 *; | [DA]DE4101417 (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [DA] 1,9,12,14 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0484236 (ACMAR SARL [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [A] 2,9-12,14; | [A]US5279500 (PERRIN MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column W *; | [DY]DE19519536 (FOERSTER NORBERT [DE]) [DY] 1,3,4 * the whole document * |