Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978349

EP0978349 - Work station [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krauseco Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH
Wolfganggasse 58-60
1120 Wien / AT
[2004/08]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Ernst Krause & Co.
Engerthstrasse 151
1021 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Holy, Franz
Dr. Adolf Schärfstrasse 3
2000 Stockerau / AT
02 / Steiner, Karl
Baslergassse 68-84/29/3
1230 Wien / AT
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Müllner, Martin , et al
Patentanwalt
Postfach 169
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]Müllner, Martin , et al
Patentanwalt Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
Former [2000/06]Müllner, Erwin, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr, Martin Müllner, Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date99890254.802.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateAT1998000134103.08.1998         Original published format: AT 134198
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978349
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978349
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978349
Date:26.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q1/54, B23Q11/08, B25J17/02, B25J19/00
[2001/06]
Former International [2000/06]B23Q1/54, B23Q11/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/46]
Former [2001/43]AT,  DE,  FR 
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Arbeitsstation[2000/06]
English:Work station[2000/06]
French:Poste de travail[2000/06]
Examination procedure30.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/39]
29.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2004Fee for grant paid
02.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9747428  (GEODETIC TECHNOLOGY INTERNATIO [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 17 - line L * * page 3, line 22 - page 6, line 5 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5715729  (TOYAMA TAIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 59 - column 5, line 21 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5401128  (LINDEM THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 20 * * column 8, line 22 - line 49 * * figures 1,2,7 *;
 [A]JPH10138085  ;
 [A]JPH04315546  ;
 [A]DE19607370  (MOELLER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 51; figure - *;
 [A]DE4309719  (BOLLMANN LEONHARDT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 30 * * figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930322), vol. 017, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 1385), [A] 1 * abstract *