Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978364

EP0978364 - Injector nozzle for an injection mould [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sterner, Franz
Pilgramstrasse 1
4614 Marchtrenk / AT
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Hübscher, Gerhard , et al
Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7
4021 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7
4021 Linz / AT
Former [2000/06]Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date99890256.304.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateAT1998000135406.08.1998         Original published format: AT 135498
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978364
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978364
Date:20.09.2000
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978364
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/00, B29C45/20, B29C45/76, B29C45/27
[2000/38]
Former International [2000/06]B29C45/00, B29C45/20, B29C45/77
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/23]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einspritzdüse für eine Spritzgussform[2000/06]
English:Injector nozzle for an injection mould[2000/06]
French:Buse d'injection pour un moule à injection[2000/06]
Examination procedure08.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
21.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
30.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2002Fee for grant paid
09.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FR25.09.2002
GB25.09.2002
Former [2004/21]GB25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0162037  (STERNER FRANZ) [X] 2 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 9; claim 1 * * page 10, line 7 - line 28; figures 1-6; claim 7 * [A] 1;
 [A]WO9727988  (AGA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 11 - line 31 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPS5845037  ;
 [A]JPH01249417
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830531), vol. 007, no. 126, Database accession no. (M - 219), [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891227), vol. 013, no. 593, Database accession no. (M - 914), [A] 1,2 * abstract *