Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051608

EP1051608 - OPTICAL SENSOR AND METHOD OF OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MASON, Richard, W.
222 Curve Street
Millis, MA 02054 / US
02 / SLOVACEK, Rudolf, E.
60 King Street
Norfolk, MA 02056 / US
03 / SULLIVAN, Kevin, J.
63 Indian Hill Road
Medfield, MA 02052 / US
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Linhart, Angela
Bayer HealthCare AG
CAO Law & Patents
Patents & Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/34]Linhart, Angela
Bayer AG Bayer HealthCare Law & Patents Patents & Licensing
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2000/46]Burkert, Frank , et al
Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99900080.518.01.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999IB00045
Priority number, dateUS1998001009621.01.1998         Original published format: US 10096
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9938001
Date:29.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051608
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051608
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/86, G01N33/543
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER SENSOR UND FUNKTIONSMETHODE[2000/46]
English:OPTICAL SENSOR AND METHOD OF OPERATION[2000/46]
French:CAPTEUR OPTIQUE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase21.08.2000National basic fee paid 
21.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
25.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2003Fee for grant paid
10.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
LU18.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
PT26.04.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
CY26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
LU18.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2005/23]AT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
LU18.01.2004
IE19.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2005/03]AT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
IE19.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2005/02]AT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
MC31.01.2004
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/52]AT26.11.2003
BE26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/33]AT26.11.2003
CH26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
LI26.11.2003
GR26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT26.11.2003
FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE26.02.2004
Cited inInternational search[XA]GB1485506  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1-6,19-26 * page 26, line 20 - page 27, line 70; figures 54,55,57,58 * [A] 7-18,27-33;
 [A]US5397538  (STARK HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-33 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4806491  (HEIM ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-33 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0646784  (MILES INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US4218421  (MACK JOHN C JR [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5011779  (MAIMON JONATHAN [US]) [A] 1-33 * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9733519  (AMERICAN BIO MEDICA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0333286  (ENVIRONMENTAL DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-33 * figure 4 *