Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970503

EP0970503 - GASEOUS BACKSCATTERED ELECTRON DETECTOR FOR AN ENVIRONMENTAL SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI COMPANY
7451 N.E. Evergreen Parkway
Hillsboro, OR 97124-5830 / US
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / KNOWLES, Ralph
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / HARDT, Thomas, A.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / SMITH, Peter, D.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Achtseweg Noord 5, Building AAE-48
5651 GG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/07]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Achtseweg Noord 5, Building AAE-48
5651 GG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/02]Bakker, Hendrik
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900089.618.01.1999
[2000/02]
WO1999IB00056
Priority number, dateUS1998001536229.01.1998         Original published format: US 15362
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939367
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970503
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970503
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/244
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/03]
Former [2000/02]DE,  FR,  GB 
TitleGerman:GASGEFÜLTER RÜCKSTREVELEKTRONENDETEKTOR FÜR RASTERELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP UNTERKONTROLLIERTER UMGEBUNG[2000/02]
English:GASEOUS BACKSCATTERED ELECTRON DETECTOR FOR AN ENVIRONMENTAL SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPE[2000/02]
French:DETECTEUR D'ELECTRONS RETRODIFFUSES GAZEUX POUR MICROSCOPE ELECTRONIQUE A BALAYAGE EN ATMOSPHERE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
17.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2004Fee for grant paid
24.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Request for further processing for:13.09.2003Request for further processing filed
07.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200305   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL23.03.2005
[2006/14]
Cited inInternational search[X]US5250808  (DANILATOS GERASIMOS D [AU], et al);
 [A]US5412211  (KNOWLES W RALPH [US]);
 [A]US4897545  (DANILATOS GERASIMOS D [AU], et al)