EP1050087 - CONNECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ACTUATING SLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMEUER, Horst Höhenstrasse 55 D-64732 Bad König / DE | 02 /
POST, Lothar, Andreas Rödernstrasse 20 D-63067 Offenbach / DE | 03 /
LIETZ, Dieter Im Sperber 18 D-60388 Frankfurt / DE | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion, et al Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion, et al AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 99900105.0 | 19.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999IB00076 | Priority number, date | DE1998102554 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19802554 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9938230 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050087 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050087 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H01R13/62905 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKER MIT EINEM BETÄTIGUNGSSCHIEBER | [2000/45] | English: | CONNECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ACTUATING SLIDE | [2000/45] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE CONNECTEUR ET GLISSIERE D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 02.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19532623 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0625809 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5618194 (MAUE HANS-HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract * |