blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970565

EP0970565 - DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A DIGITAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.07.2002  [2002/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / NUIJTEN, Petrus, A., C., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Groenendaal, Antonius W. M.
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99900237.121.01.1999
[2000/02]
WO1999IB00092
Priority number, dateEP1998020025629.01.1998         Original published format: EP 98200256
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9939440
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0970565
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE23.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03M1/12
[2000/02]
CPC:
H03M7/3042 (EP); H03H17/0219 (EP); H03M7/3026 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERARBEITEN EINS DIGITALEN SIGNALS[2000/02]
English:DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A DIGITAL SIGNAL[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR TRAITER UN SIGNAL NUMERIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
22.05.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US4236224  ;
 [A]JPH08293761
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.