Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050608

EP1050608 - HEAT-MELTABLE FLUORORESIN FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP
[2006/29]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAMARU, Shinji, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd, 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP
02 / YAMAMOTO, Katsutoshi, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd, 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP
03 / ASANO, Jun, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd, 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99900316.314.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999JP00107
Priority number, dateJP1998000843120.01.1998         Original published format: JP 843198
[2000/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936605
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050608
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050608
Date:19.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/12, D04H1/42, D01F6/32, D01F1/10, D01D5/42
[2004/25]
Former International [2000/45]D01F6/12, D04H1/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/45]
TitleGerman:HEISSSCHMELZBARE FASERN AUS FLUORHARZEN[2000/45]
English:HEAT-MELTABLE FLUORORESIN FIBERS[2000/45]
French:FIBRES DE FLUORORESINE THERMOFUSIBLES[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2000Translation filed 
10.08.2000National basic fee paid 
10.08.2000Search fee paid 
10.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
10.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
18.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2006Fee for grant paid
18.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0785302  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * page 3, line 6 - line 48 * * page 4, line 30 - line 32 * * page 6, line 49 - line 50 *;
 [XD]EP0790336  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [XD] 1,2,7-9 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 29 *
International search[Y]JPH09256217  (NITTO DENKO CORP);
 [Y]JPH08510763  ;
 [Y]JPH02169017  (AIR PROD & CHEM)