Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045876

EP1045876 - NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680
2628 VK Delft / NL
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
NEDERLANDSE ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEPAST-NATUURWETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERZOEK TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97, P.O. Box 60680
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FISCHER, Hartmut, Rudolf
Dalkruid 13
NL-5731 TP Mierlo / NL
02 / GIELGENS, Leon, Hubertus
Catharijnesingel 100 DL
NL-3511 GV Utrecht / NL
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date99900362.708.01.1999
[2000/43]
WO1999NL00006
Priority number, dateNL1998100800309.01.1998         Original published format: NL 1008003
[2000/43]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935185
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1045876
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045876
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K3/22, C08K7/00, C08F2/44
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:NANOVERBUNDMATERIAL[2000/43]
English:NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIAL[2000/43]
French:MATERIAU NANO-COMPOSITE[2000/43]
Entry into regional phase15.07.1999Translation filed 
09.08.2000National basic fee paid 
09.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2005Date of oral proceedings
02.08.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2005Fee for grant paid
17.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
CY29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
[2010/06]
Former [2008/29]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
FI29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2008/21]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
GR30.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2008/17]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/21]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
DK29.06.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
PT29.08.2006
Former [2007/03]AT29.03.2006
CH29.03.2006
LI29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
Former [2006/50]AT29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
ES10.07.2006
Former [2006/46]AT29.03.2006
SE29.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT29.03.2006
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4810734  (KAWASUMI MASAYA [JP], et al) [DA] 1-14 * example 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9608526  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9311190  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *
Examination US5658653