Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015387

EP1015387 - MECHANICAL VAPOUR RECOMPRESSION SEPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aqua Pure Ventures Inc.
103-565 Bernard Avenue
Kelowna, British Columbia V1Y 8R2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Aqua Pure Ventures Inc.
103-565 Bernard Avenue
Kelowna, British Columbia ViY 8R2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / RAZZAGHI, Minoo
400-10201 Southport Road, S.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2W 4X9 / CA
02 / SPIERING, Robert
400-10201 Southport Road, S.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2W 4X9 / CA
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Grosse, Rainer , et al
Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6A
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99900419.513.01.1999
[2000/27]
WO1999CA00022
Priority number, dateGB1998001023114.05.1998         Original published format: GB 9810231
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9959922
Date:25.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015387
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/04, B01D1/28, B01D3/32, B01D5/00, C02F1/10
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:TRENNUNGSVERFAHREN MIT WIEDERERHITZUNG DURCH MECHANISCHEN KOMPRIMIERTEN DAMPF[2000/27]
English:MECHANICAL VAPOUR RECOMPRESSION SEPARATION PROCESS[2000/27]
French:PROCEDE DE SEPARATION PAR RECOMPRESSION DE VAPEUR MECANIQUE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2000National basic fee paid 
14.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
14.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/01]
29.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[PA]WO9831445  (AQUA PURE VENTURES INC [CA], et al) [PA] 1,6-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4566947  (TSURUTA HIDEMASA [JP]) [Y] 1,7,19-23,26 * column 2, line 54 - column 5, line 59; figure 2 *;
 [YA]DE2346609  (HOECK HORST) [Y] 1,7,19-23,26 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 4 * [A] 2-6,9-14;
 [YA]FR2482979  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1,7,19-23 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 5; figure 2 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * [A] 8,24;
 [A]US4940134  (AOKI SYOZO [JP], et al) [A] 22,23 * column 14, line 30 - column 15, line 47; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4318936  (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,8,12,14 *Abstract*; column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 46 *;
 [A]EP0520793  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 17,18 *Abstract*;
 [A]EP0524825  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP], et al) [A] 17,18 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4539076  (SWAIN R L BIBB [US]);
 [A]FR2091483  (HYDRO CHEM & MINERAL CORP);
 [A]GB1147441  (WEIR WESTGARTH LTD)