Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050056

EP1050056 - MAGNETIC ENGRAVING METHOD, IN PARTICULAR FOR MAGNETIC OR MAGNETO-OPTICAL RECORDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel-Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHAPPERT, Claude
1, rue des Cliquets
F-92380 Garches / FR
02 / BERNAS, Harry
23, rue Louis Morard
F-75014 Paris / FR
03 / FERRE, Jacques
17, allée du Moulin de Migneaux
F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Schrimpf, Robert , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Schrimpf, Robert , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99900523.412.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999FR00043
Priority number, dateFR1998000019912.01.1998         Original published format: FR 9800199
[2000/45]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9935657
Date:15.07.1999
Language:FR
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050056
Date:08.11.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050056
Date:20.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F41/14, G11B11/10, H01P11/00
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MAGNETISCHEN GRAVUR FÜR MAGNETISCHE ODER MAGNETO-OPTISCHE AUFZEICHNUNG[2000/45]
English:MAGNETIC ENGRAVING METHOD, IN PARTICULAR FOR MAGNETIC OR MAGNETO-OPTICAL RECORDING[2000/45]
French:PROCEDE DE GRAVURE MAGNETIQUE, POUR NOTAMMENT L'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE OU MAGNETO-OPTIQUE[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2000National basic fee paid 
31.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
26.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2002Fee for grant paid
12.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
CY12.01.2003
CH31.01.2003
LI31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
[2007/21]
Former [2005/02]AT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
CY12.01.2003
CH31.01.2003
LI31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2004/44]AT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
CY12.01.2003
CH31.01.2003
LI31.01.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2004/02]AT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
CH31.01.2003
LI31.01.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/43]AT20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/37]AT20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPH01292699  ;
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900214), vol. 014, no. 078, Database accession no. (P - 1006), [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * abstract *
 [Y]  - XIAO J Q ET AL, "EFFECTS OF AR-ION IMPLANTATION AND ANNEALING ON STRUCTURAL AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF CO/PD MULTILAYERS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19941115), vol. 76, no. 10, PART 02, pages 6081 - 6083, XP000508709 [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.358371
 [A]  - AMARAL L ET AL, "VERY THIN FE/NI MODULATION MULTILAYER FILMS UNDER ION BOMBARDMENT", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19970415), vol. 81, no. 8, PART 02B, pages 4773 - 4775, XP000701105 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.364679
 [A]  - GLADYSZEWSKI G ET AL, "MODIFICATION OF STRUCTURE, ELECTRIC AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIES OF EPITAXIALLY GROWN AG(001)/FE(001) SUPERLATTICES", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (19960401), vol. 156, no. 1/03, page 381/382, XP000589438 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-8853(95)00908-6
 [A]  - CHOE G ET AL, "EFFECT OF ION BEAM MIXING ON MICROSTRUCTURE AND MAGNETIC PROPERTIESOF GD-CO MULTILAYER FILMS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19960415), vol. 79, no. 8, PART 02B, pages 6306 - 6308, XP000695063 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.362046
 [A]  - SCHELP L F ET AL, "STRUCTURAL AND MAGNETIC BEHAVIOR OF AR+-IMPLANTED CO/PD MULTILAYERS: INTERFACIAL MIXING", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19940515), vol. 75, no. 10, PART 01, pages 5262 - 5266, XP000444334 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.355725