EP1050346 - METHOD OF FORMING MULTILAYERED TOPCOAT FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 33-1, Kanzakicho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0964 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LTD. 33-1, Kanzakicho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0964 / JP | ||
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states KANSAI PAINT CO., LIMITED 33-1, Kanzakicho Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661-0964 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGANO, Hiroyuki 3-301-402, Hirabari Tenpaku-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 468-0011 / JP | 02 /
SUGAI, Hideo 580-1-24, Shindo Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0017 / JP | 03 /
OKUMURA, Yasumasa 5-34-17, Rokkakubashi Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0802 / JP | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/45] | Barz, Peter, et al Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99900661.2 | 22.01.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999JP00243 | Priority number, date | JP19980010963 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: JP 1096398 | [2000/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9937410 | Date: | 29.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050346 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050346 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/24, B05D7/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B05D7/577 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/45] | B05D7/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN DECKSCHICHT | [2000/45] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING MULTILAYERED TOPCOAT FILM | [2000/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN REVETEMENT MULTICOUCHE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2000 | Translation filed | 18.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0823289 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3,5,8,9 * page 3, line 30 - page 6, line 47 *; | [X]WO9633814 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US4933214 (SUGIURA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH03229674 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920107), vol. 016, no. 001, Database accession no. (C - 0899), & JP03229674 A 19911011 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH03229674 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPH05138115 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0538482 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD); | [A]JPH0688056 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0418967 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) |