Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979116

EP0979116 - INHALANT MEDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
For all designated states
DOTT LIMITED COMPANY
5-3, Fujimigaoka, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 224-0051 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/14]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
For all designated states
DOTT LIMITED COMPANY
5-3, Fujimigaoka, Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0051 / JP
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
UNISIA JECS CORPORATION
1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-8510 / JP
For all designated states
DOTT LIMITED COMPANY
5-3, Fujimigaoka, Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0051 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHKI, Hisatomo
Unisia Jecs Corporation, 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
02 / NAKAMURA, Shigemi
Unisia Jecs Corporation, 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
03 / ISHIZEKI, Kazunori
Unisia Jecs Corporation, 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
04 / YAZAWA, Yoshiyuki
Unisia Jecs Corporation, 1370, Onna
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP
05 / YANAGAWA, Akira
Dott Limited Company, 5-3, Fujimigaoka, Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-0051 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99900662.022.01.1999
[2000/07]
WO1999JP00245
Priority number, dateJP1998003967405.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3967498
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939760
Date:12.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979116
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979116
Date:09.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   PT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:INHALATIONSAPPARAT[2000/07]
English:INHALANT MEDICATOR[2000/07]
French:INHALATEUR DE MEDICAMENTS[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2004Fee for grant paid
01.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0796628  (UNISIA JECS CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 33 - column 8, line 19 * * column 13, line 18 - line 40 * * figures 1,5,6 * [Y] 3-6;
 [Y]US4724869  (CARTER WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 3-6 * column 1, line 60 - line 65 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 34 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0387222  (DRACO AB [SE]) [A] 3,4 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 28 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5165392  (SMALL JR JOHN C [US]) [A] 3 * column 5, line 26 - line 41 * * figure 5 *
by applicantJPH0847531