Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049435

EP1049435 - HEARING PROTECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Simply Silence Simsin B.V.
Oudenbosscheweg 6
4751 SH Oud Gastel / NL
[2000/45]
Inventor(s)01 / TIEMANN, Rudi Peter
Meeuwenlaan 35
3222 Hellevoetsluis / NL
[2000/45]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2004/51]
Former [2000/45]Riemens, Roelof Harm
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date99900715.618.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999NL00031
Priority number, dateNL1998100806519.01.1998         Original published format: NL 1008065
NL1998100806619.01.1998         Original published format: NL 1008066
[2000/45]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9936016
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049435
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F11/08
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:GEHÖRSCHUTZ[2000/45]
English:HEARING PROTECTOR[2000/45]
French:PROTECTEUR D'OREILLES[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase18.01.1999Translation filed 
28.07.2000National basic fee paid 
28.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
01.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/29]
05.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/29]
12.04.2005Date of oral proceedings
29.09.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Public notificationsDecision: The request filed for re-establishment of rights pursuant to Article 122 EPC into the omitted time limit of Article 86 (2) EPC for payment of the fourth annual fee plus additional fee is refused. Last address: Oudenbosscheweg 6, 4751 SH Oud Gastel, PAYS-BAS
Simply Silence Simsin B.V.
Oudenbosscheweg 6
4751 SH Oud Gastel / NL
[2006/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200204   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200305   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200406   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200507   M06   Not yet paid
31.01.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4008982  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,4,7,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9313061U  (LOHMANN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3; figure - *;
 [A]EP0336487  (SCHOONENBERG HOORTOESTELLEN B [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2236112  (SIGMA SALES CORP OF CALIFORNIA) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0244979  (SAFER SAFETY LTD [GB]);
 [A]US4540063  (OCHI AKIRA [JP], et al)