Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050130

EP1050130 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH STAR / RING TOPOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street London
EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HILL, Alan Michael
The Old Police House, Park Road, Grundisburgh
Woodbridge, Suffolk IP13 6TP / GB
 [2003/50]
Former [2000/45]01 / HILL, Alan Michael
The Old Police House, Park Road Grundisburgh
Woodbridge, Suffolk IP13 6TP / GB
Representative(s)Wallin, Nicholas James , et al
BT Group Legal
Intellectual Property Department, PP C5A
BT Centre
81 Newgate Street
London EC1A 7AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]Wallin, Nicholas James , et al
BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Former [2000/45]Wilson, Peter David , et al
BT Group Legal Services Intellectual Property Department 8th Floor, Holborn Centre 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2TE / GB
Application number, filing date99901053.115.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999GB00140
Priority number, dateGB1998000120920.01.1998         Original published format: GB 9801209
GB1998000345818.02.1998         Original published format: GB 9803458
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9937050
Date:22.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050130
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050130
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04J14/02, H04Q11/00, H04B10/207, H04B10/213
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/45]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT STERN / RING TOPOLOGY[2000/45]
English:COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM WITH STAR / RING TOPOLOGY[2000/45]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC TOPOLOGIE EN ETOILE/EN ANNEAU[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2000National basic fee paid 
19.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
26.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2003Fee for grant paid
13.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.12.2003
ES10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
[2007/21]
Former [2004/52]BE10.12.2003
NL10.12.2003
Former [2004/33]NL10.12.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0599177  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 5 * column 6, line 6 - line 28 * * column 6, line 46 - line 49 * * column 10, line 3 - column 11, line 4 * * column 20, line 17 - line 40 * * figures 5,9,18 * [Y] 1-4;
 [Y]EP0458628  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 13, line 7 - line 23 * * column 15, line 40 - column 16, line 6 * * column 8, line 23 - line 58 * * column 21, line 17 - line 20 * * column 22, line 57 - column 23, line 48 * * column 24, line 15 - line 32 * * figures 1,7,10,27A *;
 [XA]JPS58177041  ;
 [XA]WO9519689  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 5 * page 7, line 3 - line 12 * * page 7, line 19 - line 35 * * page 10, line 20 - line 33 * * page 11, line 11 - line 21 * [A] 1,2,4;
 [XA]DE19537103  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 5 * column 1, line 34 - line 54 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 * [A] 1,2,4;
 [A]US5502586  (OHNSORGE HORST [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 42 - line 58 * * column 3, line 12 - line 38 * * column 4, line 16 - line 39 * * column 5, line 28 - line 51 * * figures 1,6 *;
 [ED]WO9833287  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [ED] 5 * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 17 * * figures 6,10 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840120), vol. 008, no. 013, Database accession no. (E - 222), [X] 5 * abstract * [A] 3