Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052943

EP1052943 - ABSORBABLE PROSTHETIC MOUNTING CLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOFRADIM PRODUCTION
116, avenue du Formans
01600 Trévoux / FR
For all designated states
PHUSIS
Z.A. Randon, 58, route du Rivet
38330 Saint Ismier / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
SOFRADIM PRODUCTION
116, avenue du Formans
01600 Trévoux / FR
For all designated states
PHUSIS
Z.A. Randon, 58, route du Rivet
38330 Saint Ismier / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ORY, François, Régis
140, allée du Château
F-69270 Fontaines Saint Martin / FR
02 / THERIN, Michel
4, rue Alphonse Fochier
F-69002 Lyon / FR
03 / HUET-OLIVIER, Jacqueline
309, chemin des Petites Roches
F-38330 Saint Ismier / FR
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Guerre, Dominique , et al
Cabinet Germain et Maureau
12 Rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Guerre, Dominique , et al
Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date99901081.203.02.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999IB00190
Priority number, dateFR1998000150903.02.1998         Original published format: FR 9801509
[2000/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939645
Date:12.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052943
Date:22.11.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052943
Date:05.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/064
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERBARE BEFESTIGUNGSKLEMME FÜR EINE PROTHESE[2000/47]
English:ABSORBABLE PROSTHETIC MOUNTING CLIP[2000/47]
French:AGRAFE DE FIXATION PROTHETIQUE RESORBABLE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2000National basic fee paid 
30.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
30.10.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2001Fee for grant paid
27.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.12.2001
FI05.12.2001
NL05.12.2001
LU03.02.2002
CY28.02.2002
DK05.03.2002
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
MC01.09.2002
[2006/44]
Former [2004/39]AT05.12.2001
FI05.12.2001
NL05.12.2001
LU03.02.2002
CY28.02.2002
DK05.03.2002
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
Former [2004/10]AT05.12.2001
FI05.12.2001
NL05.12.2001
CY28.02.2002
DK05.03.2002
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
Former [2003/46]AT05.12.2001
FI05.12.2001
NL05.12.2001
DK05.03.2002
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
Former [2003/10]AT05.12.2001
FI05.12.2001
NL05.12.2001
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
Former [2002/48]FI05.12.2001
PT05.03.2002
SE05.03.2002
Former [2002/33]FI05.12.2001
SE05.03.2002
Former [2002/27]SE05.03.2002
Documents cited:Search   [ ] : "Römpp chemie lexikon, volume 5", 1992, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART-NEW YORK, STUTTGART
International search[XDY]US5203864  (PHILLIPS EDWARD H [US]) [XD] 1,2,4 * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 22; figures 14-17 * [Y] 3,5,6;
 [YD]US4696300  (ANDERSON GARY [US]) [YD] 3 * column 2, lines 53-57 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 7; figure - *;
 [YD]US5320633  (ALLEN WILLIAM C [US], et al) [YD] 5,6 * column 2, lines 23-39; figure - *;
 [X]US3716058  (TANNER J) [X] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO8701270  (ACUFEX MICROSURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5320633
 US5203864
 US4696300