Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1049848

EP1049848 - ANTI-THEFT CASE, PARTICULARLY FOR COMPACT DISKS, VIDEOCASSETTES, MUSICASSETTES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NECCHI S.r.l.
Via L. Einaudi 8 Zona D 4
I-15100 Alessandria / IT
[2000/45]
Inventor(s)01 / NECCHI, Pietro
Via Dante, 7
I-15013 Borgoratto / IT
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Garavelli, Paolo
A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L.
Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale
Via Servais 27
10146 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/52]Garavelli, Paolo
A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L., Via Servais 27
10146 Torino / IT
Former [2000/45]Caramelli, Mariella
c/o A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Via Servais 27
10146 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99901105.915.01.1999
[2000/45]
WO1999IT00004
Priority number, dateIT1998TO00017U29.01.1998         Original published format: IT TO980017 U
IT1998TO0009405.02.1998         Original published format: IT TO980094
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939068
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1049848
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1049848
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05B73/00, G11B33/04
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/45]
Extension statesAL06.07.2000
TitleGerman:ANTI-DIEBSTAHLGEHÄUSE, INSBESONDERE FÜR KOMPAKT DISKS, VIDEOKASSETTEN, AUDIOKASSETTEN, ODER ÄHNLICHES[2000/45]
English:ANTI-THEFT CASE, PARTICULARLY FOR COMPACT DISKS, VIDEOCASSETTES, MUSICASSETTES AND THE LIKE[2000/45]
French:BOITIER ANTIVOL POUR DISQUES COMPACTS, CASSETTES VIDEO, CASSETTES AUDIO ET ANALOGUES[2000/45]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2000National basic fee paid 
06.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
16.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2001Fee for grant paid
30.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE29507538U  (PLASTI MAX SRL [IT]) [A] 7,11,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0616103  (PATACO AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9300495  (LIFT VERKAUFSGERAETE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9514841  (MW TRADING APS [DK], et al) [A] 1,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0508201  (PATACO AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2628717  (MICROTECHNIC SA [MC]) [A] 1,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0402822  (NECCHI MODULARE MUSICA [IT]) [DA] 1,7,12 * the whole document *